FL S0906 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring an application for a charter school to contain a list of certain information regarding all charter schools currently or previously operated by the applicant, applicant group, or proposed management company; requiring a sponsor to consider current or previous charter school performance by the applicant, applicant group, or proposed management company; authorizing a sponsor to deny an application based on charter school failures, etc.
Title
Charter Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/11/15, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Discussed/Workshop |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0720 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S1552 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
S1552 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/906 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0906/BillText/Filed/HTML |