FL S0906 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting attorneys from engaging in misleading advertisement related to medicinal drugs; providing requirements for pharmacy contracts and auditing entities; revising the rights that pharmacies have if audits are conducted; prohibiting audits from considering as fraud any clerical and recordkeeping error, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescribed Drug Services and Audits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Banking and Insurance
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H271 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
S650 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H559 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4651871Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651885Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624491Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62742392Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62742393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62764741Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62764742Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276572Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62766998Amended CodeSee Bill Text
641314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413924Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback