FL S0908 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring, beginning on a certain date, that a uniform fire alarm permit application, along with certain other information, be used and submitted to the local enforcement agency for any project requiring a fire alarm permit; authorizing local authorities having jurisdiction to accept uniform summary inspection reports of certain fire hydrants and fire protection systems by certain means; requiring that condominium association bylaws provide requirements for the association's reasonable compliance with the Florida Fire Prevention Code; extending the date before which a local authority having jurisdiction may not require completion of a condominium's retrofitting with a fire sprinkler system, etc.
Title
Firesafety Systems
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165) |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Substituted HB 647 (Died in returning Messages) |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 3 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/02/19, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-21 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/18/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H723 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
H647 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
H1393 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-140, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1024 (Ch. 2019-52)
S1152 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S1732 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S1704 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140)
H7103 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-165, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 207 (Ch. 2019-106)
H647 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
H1393 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-140, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1024 (Ch. 2019-52)
S1152 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S1732 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S1704 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140)
H7103 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-165, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 207 (Ch. 2019-106)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 792 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |