FL S0912 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Innovation, Industry, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that certain reports relating to the transportation or possession of cigarettes be filed with the Division of Alcoholic Beverages and Tobacco through the division's electronic data submission system; renaming the Florida State Boxing Commission as the Florida Athletic Commission; revising requirements for issuing special licenses to certain food service establishments; providing the circumstances under which a person is delinquent in the payment of an assessment in the context of eligibility for membership on certain condominium boards, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Business and Professional Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Community Affairs; Appropriations
2019-11-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H623 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - CS/CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
H689 (Same As) 2020-01-16 - CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time
S1154 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
455219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
54805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7185014Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback