FL S0916 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Defining the terms "heavy equipment rental property," "dealer of heavy equipment rental property," and "short-term rental," and redefining the term "inventory," for purposes of provisions relating to the imposition of ad valorem taxes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ad Valorem Taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Community Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2017-11-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1271 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
112312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
192001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
192042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6245105Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback