FL S0924 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Business and Professional Regulation and the Department of Health, respectively, to grant an application for licensure if the applicant has completed an apprenticeship and met other specified requirements; requiring the department to establish the grade necessary for an applicant who has completed an apprenticeship to receive a passing grade for an examination, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational Licensing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Health Policy; Rules
2019-02-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H981 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
455216Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560155Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback