FL S0924 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that, in third-party bad faith actions against insurers, insureds and claimants have the burden to prove that an insurer acted in reckless disregard for insured rights which resulted in damage to the insured or the claimant; providing that insured or claimant actions or inactions are relevant in bad faith actions; providing that an insurer is not liable if certain conditions are met; providing that an insurer is not liable beyond available policy limits as to certain competing third-party claims if it files an interpleader action within a certain timeframe, etc.
Title
Civil Actions Against Insurers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/28/20, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Filed |