FL S0942 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01246; Substituted CS/HB 729 -SJ 01246; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 729 (Ch. 2010-220) -SJ 01246
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01246; Substituted CS/HB 729 -SJ 01246; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 729 (Ch. 2010-220) -SJ 01246
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain personnel who perform tattooing for medical or dental purposes from regulation under specified provisions. Prohibits the practice of tattooing except by a person licensed or registered by the DOH. Requires tattoo artists to complete an education course and pass an examination. Requires the licensure of permanent tattoo establishments and temporary establishments, etc.
Title
Practice of Tattooing [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01246; Substituted CS/HB 729 -SJ 01246; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 729 (Ch. 2010-220) -SJ 01246 | |
2010-04-28 | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00925; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-21 | Withdrawn from Finance and Tax -SJ 00701; Now in Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2010-04-15 | Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00635 | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00635 | |
2010-04-09 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/14/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-04-08 | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice -SJ 00523; Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2010-03-22 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 00279 | |
2010-03-19 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-18 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00279; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00284 | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/18/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Regulation; Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Finance and Tax; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00068 | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Health Regulation; Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Finance and Tax; Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2009-12-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0729 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-220
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0381 | 00771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00773 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00775 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00777 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00779 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00781 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00783 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00785 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00787 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00789 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00791 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0468 | 851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0468 | 853 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0468 | 854 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0468 | 855 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0468 | 856 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0468 | 857 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0468 | 859 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0468 | 861 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0468 | 863 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0468 | 867 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0468 | 869 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0877 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |