FL S0942 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that, under certain circumstances, a person who provides interpreting or transliterating services possess a credential issued under the act; providing a temporary exception for a person who holds a credential from another state; requiring that the credentialing entity establish the Interpreters for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing Advisory Board; prohibiting the use of public funds to employ interpreters or transliterators who do not hold valid credentials; requiring that a person practicing as an interpreter or transliterator on or after a specified date apply for a credential, etc.
Title
Interpreters and Transliterators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Regulated Industries | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 79 | |
2011-12-06 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Education Pre-K - 12; Budget -SJ 79 | |
2011-11-15 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/942 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0942/BillText/Filed/HTML |