FL S0942 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to provide for the election of the Commissioner of Education, the inclusion of the commissioner as a member of the Cabinet, and the establishment of the Governor and Cabinet as the State Board of Education, etc.
Title
Composition of Cabinet/Election of Commissioner of Education/State Board of Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Now in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/02/16, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Education Pre-K - 12; Rules |
2015-11-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0767 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/942 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0942/BillText/Filed/HTML |