FL S0942 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Criminal Justice Standards and Training Commission to include specified implicit bias training in instruction related to dealing with diverse populations; requiring the State Board of Education to develop requirements for training for all K-12 instructional personnel and administrators in recognizing and overcoming implicit bias; requesting that the Supreme Court develop training requirements for judges in recognizing and overcoming implicit bias, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implicit Bias Training

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2019-11-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H463 (Similar To) 2019-12-12 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9431716Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback