FL S0946 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 737
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 737
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that public school principals require teachers to set aside time for a moment of silence at the beginning of each school day; prohibiting teachers from making suggestions as to the nature of any reflection that a student may engage in during the moment of silence; requiring certain teachers to encourage parents to discuss the moment of silence with their children and to make suggestions as to the best use of this time, etc.
Title
Moments of Silence in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 737 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted HB 737 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 6 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-11-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H737 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/946 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/946/BillText/Filed/HTML |