FL S0948 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing that a health care practitioner's failure to repay a student loan or to comply with service scholarship obligations does not constitute grounds for disciplinary action; removing a civil fine; removing the requirement that the Department of Health investigate and prosecute health care practitioners for failing to repay a student loan or to comply with scholarship service obligations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Loans and Scholarship Obligations of Health Care Practitioners

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1090 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H991 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560721Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback