FL S0952 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that participation in the Senior Management Service Class of the Florida Retirement System is compulsory for each appointed criminal conflict and civil regional counsel and specified staff of the regional counsel beginning on a specified date; authorizing members of the class to purchase and upgrade certain retirement credit, etc.
Title
Senior Management Service Class
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#729 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Chapter No. 2020-120 | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-05 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/21/20, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2019-11-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H605 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 952 passed