FL S0976 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs Program Act"; requiring the Department of Law Enforcement to contract with a corporation not for profit to administer and manage the program; providing requirements for the disbursement of funds for the veterinary care of eligible retired law enforcement dogs, etc.
Title
Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H841 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/976 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/976/BillText/Filed/HTML |