FL S0980 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain animal shelters, humane organizations, or animal control agencies that take receivership of any lost, stray, unwanted, or homeless dogs or cats to adopt written policies and procedures to achieve specified goals; authorizing employees, agents, or contractors of certain animal shelters or animal control agencies to implant dogs and cats with radio-frequency identification devices for certain purposes, etc.
Title
Lost, Stray, Unwanted, or Homeless Dogs and Cats
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H685 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/980 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/980/BillText/Filed/HTML |