FL S1000 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain governing bodies to apply to the OTTED to amend the boundary of an enterprise zone that includes a rural area of critical economic concern. Provides a limitation. Authorizes the office to approve the amendment application subject to certain requirements. Authorizes Martin County to apply to the OTTED for designation of an enterprise zone. Authorizes the office to designate an enterprise zone in Martin County, etc.
Title
Enterprise Zones [CPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Negron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Commerce | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00071 | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Commerce; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-12-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0371 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA)
S1754 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
S1754 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0290 | 0055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0290 | 00726 | New Code | See Bill Text |