FL S1000 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of "concealed weapon" to delete its inclusion of a slungshot; deleting provisions prohibiting the manufacture or sale of any instrument or weapon usually known as slungshot; deleting a provision prohibiting a dealer in arms from selling or transferring a slungshot to a minor, etc.
Title
Slungshot
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/30/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/23/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H4023 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
790 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1000 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1000/BillText/Filed/HTML |