FL S1010 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2016-61), CS/CS/HB 749 (Ch. 2016-88)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2016-61), CS/CS/HB 749 (Ch. 2016-88)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Preempting to the department the regulation of the use or sale of polystyrene products by entities regulated under the Florida Food Safety Act; revising the powers and duties of the Division of Marketing and Development to remove the enforcement provisions relating to the dealers in agricultural products law; revising the duties of the director of the Division of Consumer Services to include enforcement provisions relating to the dealers in agricultural products law; creating the Grove Removal or Vector Elimination (GROVE) Program, etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2016-61), CS/CS/HB 749 (Ch. 2016-88) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 7007 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 01/21/16, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | CS by Agriculture read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/11/16, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7007 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 2016-61, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 749 (Ch. 2016-88)
H0749 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-88, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2016-61)
S1310 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 749 (Ch. 2016-88), CS/CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2016-61)
H0749 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-88, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2016-61)
S1310 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 749 (Ch. 2016-88), CS/CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2016-61)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 0521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 1562 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 544 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 681 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 685 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
571 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
571 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
571 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
576 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
580 | 0365 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 189 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
589 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
604 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
604 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |