FL S1020 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the state hemp program within the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; requiring licensees to use specified hemp seeds and cultivars; revising the colleges and universities at which the department is required to authorize and oversee the development of industrial hemp pilot projects; removing a condition for the implementation of industrial hemp commercialization projects, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Hemp Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#341 (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#340 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-03SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (024859)
2019-05-01SenateIn returning messages
2019-05-01HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 1
2019-05-01HouseAmendment(s) adopted (119005, 751155) 1117
2019-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30HouseAmendment(s) adopted (250377) 1077
2019-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HouseReceived
2019-04-29HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-25HouseIn Messages
2019-04-25SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2019-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24SenateOrdered engrossed
2019-04-24SenateAmendment(s) adopted (925196)
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-16SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-15SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-11SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2019-04-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-02SenateCS by Agriculture read 1st time
2019-03-27SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-03-27SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations
2019-03-27SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules
2019-03-27SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-25SenateCS by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-06SenateNow in Agriculture
2019-03-06SenateFavorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/06/19, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Agriculture; Rules
2019-02-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H333 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table
S1058 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S1558 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S7088 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H1329 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
S7102 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10044473Amended CodeSee Bill Text
581084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
581217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020/Amendment/867164/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020/Amendment/925196/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020/Amendment/369856/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020/Vote/SenateVote_s01020e1014.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020/Vote/HouseVote_s01020e1340.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020/Vote/HouseVote_s01020e1341.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1020/Vote/SenateVote_s01020e1024.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback