FL S1020 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a nursing home facility to establish and implement an institutional formulary; requiring a nursing home facility to maintain written policies and procedures for the institutional formulary; authorizing a pharmacist to therapeutically substitute medicinal drugs under an institutional formulary established by a nursing home facility, under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Institutional Formularies Established by Nursing Home Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 559 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 559 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/29/20, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/28/20, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H559 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-103
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1020 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1020/BillText/Filed/HTML |