FL S1028 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 417
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Re-creates the Administrative Trust Fund within the Department of Education without modification. Abrogates provisions relating to the termination of the trust fund, to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative Trust Fund/Department of Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#113 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-06 Ordered enrolled -SJ 417
2011-04-06 Substituted for HB 7055 -HJ 427
2011-04-01 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/06/11
2011-03-31 Referred to Calendar -HJ 379
2011-03-15 In Messages
2011-03-15 Read 2nd time -SJ 222
2011-03-11 Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -SJ 204
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 78
2011-02-14 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/23/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2011-02-11 SPB 7030 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1028) by Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

H7055 () 2011-04-06 - Substituted SB 1028

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1001282Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback