FL S1028 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health Regulation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing the creation of Section 28 of Article X and the creation of Section 32 of Article XII of the State Constitution to allow the medical use of cannabis by citizens, allow the Legislature to implement these provisions by general law, etc

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Use of Cannabis

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Health Regulation
2012-01-10 Introduced -SJ 85
2011-12-08 Referred to Health Regulation; Judiciary; Budget; Rules -SJ 85
2011-11-18 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback