FL S1028 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Directing the Department of Environmental Protection to establish an online hydraulic fracturing chemical registry; requiring owners and operators of wells on which a hydraulic fracturing treatment is performed to disclose certain information; requiring certain service providers and vendors to disclose certain information, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fracturing Chemical Usage Disclosure Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03SenateDied in Rules
2013-04-23SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2013-04-18SenateNow in Rules
2013-04-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2013-04-16SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2013-04-11SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time
2013-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/16/13, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2013-04-11SenateNow in Community Affairs
2013-04-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2013-04-09SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2013-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 04/09/13, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2013-03-05SenateIntroduced
2013-02-25SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; Rules
2013-02-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1776 (Related) 2013-05-03 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
H0743 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
H0745 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback