FL S1028 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing online voting by members of a corporation not for profit; requiring written consent by a member for online voting; providing that a member voting electronically is counted as being in attendance at the meeting; requiring a corporation to establish procedures and deadlines for members to consent to or opt out of online voting, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Online Voting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2015-12-17SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
2015-12-02SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6170721Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback