FL S1028 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1285
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing social purpose corporations and benefit corporations to omit certain information from annual benefit reports; requiring that annual benefit reports expressly state that such information was omitted, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 1285
2018-03-05SenateSubstituted HB 1285
2018-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar for 03/05/2018
2018-03-01SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-22SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/22/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-31SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-30SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/30/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-23SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-22SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
2017-11-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1285 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-139

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
607512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
607612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65823Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65830Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65836Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback