FL S1028 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Sexual Assault Survivors' Bill of Rights"; providing for the attachment and duration of survivor rights; prohibiting a medical provider from charging a survivor for certain incurred costs; prohibiting a law enforcement officer, prosecutor, or defense attorney from discouraging a survivor from receiving a certain medical exam; requiring law enforcement officers and prosecutors to provide certain information to a survivor upon his or her written request, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Survivors of Sexual Offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations; Rules
2019-11-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H727 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H541 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S892 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
943326Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9600013Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback