FL S1030 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the mitigating circumstances under which a departure from the lowest permissible sentence is reasonably justified; authorizing mitigation of the lowest permissible sentence when a defendant requires specialized treatment for a certain substance addiction and is amenable to treatment, etc.
Title
Mitigating Circumstances in Sentencing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/04/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-21 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 08435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 00265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |