FL S1052 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing provisions which comprise the Florida Motor Vehicle No-Fault Law; revising the motor vehicle insurance coverages that an applicant must show to register certain vehicles with the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles; revising minimum liability coverage requirements for motor vehicle owners or operators; providing that private passenger motor vehicle policies may exclude certain identified individuals from specified coverages under certain circumstances; revising the minimum net worth requirements to qualify certain persons as self-insurers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-01SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-01SenateFavorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/01/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-14SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2019-03-14SenateNow in Banking and Insurance
2019-03-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-12SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
2019-02-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H733 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
S896 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H765 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
S1232 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316646Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320771Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3240221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3240222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409910Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269541Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626989Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62706501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270652Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270653Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627727Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277278Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627728Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627730Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627733Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627734Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627737Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627739Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627747Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627748Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6278405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
628909Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705184Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71378Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817234Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback