FL S1054 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a court to offer an option for verification of participation in self-help groups or activities to certain defendants, etc.
Title
Treatment-based Drug Court Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-19 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/18/20, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H941 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs