FL S1056 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Juvenile Justice to contract with the PACE Center for Girls for specified services, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PACE Center for Girls

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#652 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Chapter No. 2020-121
2020-06-29 Approved by Governor
2020-06-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-10SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-10HouseCS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2020-03-10HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-09HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-09HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-06HouseReceived
2020-03-06HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-03-06HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-02-04HouseIn Messages
2020-02-04SenateImmediately certified
2020-02-04SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-02-04SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-04SenateRead 2nd time
2020-01-29SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/04/20
2020-01-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-01-23SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2020-01-22SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/23/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-01-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-14SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations
2019-11-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H681 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1056 passed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
985175Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback