FL S1062 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising parent and guardian notification requirements that must be met before an involuntary examination of a minor; creating reporting requirements for schools relating to involuntary examinations of minors; requiring that certain plans include procedures to assist certain mental and behavioral health providers in attempts to verbally de-escalate certain crisis situations before initiating an involuntary examination, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Involuntary Examinations of Minors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Education
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-10SenateNow in Education
2020-02-06SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-04SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-01-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Education; Rules
2019-11-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H407 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
H1083 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S1426 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S7040 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7065

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1001212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback