FL S1070 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to authorize the imposition of term limits on county commissioners when provided by county charter, etc.
Title
Term Limits/County Commissioners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Judiciary | |
2012-02-01 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 301 | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time -SJ 305 | |
2012-01-31 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-30 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 301 | |
2012-01-25 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/30/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 87 | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary -SJ 87 | |
2011-11-28 | Filed |