FL S1074 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1145 (Ch. 2013-152)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising provisions relating to the update of an inventory of certain facilities needing repairs or innovation maintained by the Department of Management Services; requiring state agencies to explain why available underused property is not sufficient to meet their needs when requesting fixed capital outlay projects; requiring all state-owned facilities to report energy consumption and cost data; creating the Underused Property Maximization Program in the Department of Management Services, etc. APPROPRIATION:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State-owned or State-leased Space

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-25SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1145 (Ch. 2013-152)
2013-04-25SenateSubstituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1145
2013-04-25SenateAmendment(s) adopted (291790, 387614, 560898, 938794, 940152)
2013-04-25SenateRead 2nd time
2013-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13
2013-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2013-04-23SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2013-04-23SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2013-04-18SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2013-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/13, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2013-04-08SenateNow in Appropriations
2013-04-04SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time
2013-04-04SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2013-04-02SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2013-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 04/02/13, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2013-03-21SenateNow in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
2013-03-21SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2013-03-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/21/13, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2013-03-05SenateIntroduced
2013-02-28SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations
2013-02-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1145 (Similar To) 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-152

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2160152Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
253031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
253034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255248Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255249Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25525Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255252Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255254Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255257Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985682Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/BillText/c2/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/457772/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/665952/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/286430/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/729378/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/274856/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/846066/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/843022/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/248012/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/139904/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/560898/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/938794/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/890710/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/940152/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/291790/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1074/Amendment/387614/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback