FL S1074 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a Florida College System institution to serve any secondary dual enrollment student who resides outside the institution's designated service area; authorizing the board of trustees of a Florida College System institution to establish dual enrollment articulation agreements with any district school superintendent; authorizing a state university to serve secondary dual enrollment students who reside anywhere in the state, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dual Enrollment Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02SenateDied in Education
2014-03-04SenateIntroduced
2014-02-21SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2014-02-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0961 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100160Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100164Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback