FL S1074 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Higher Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the ESOL Graduation Transition Program within the Department of Education; requiring an eligible student to continue taking certain classes while enrolled in the program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Graduation Transition Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateDied in Higher Education
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateReferred to Higher Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2015-02-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0761 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003565Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback