FL S1074 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to allow the Legislature to limit growth in the assessed value of homestead and specified nonhomestead property to the growth rate in just value, to prohibit increases in the assessed value of homestead and specified nonhomestead property if the just value of the property decreases, and to provide an effective date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Assessments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateDied in Appropriations
2016-01-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2016-01-25SenateFavorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2016-01-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 01/25/16, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2016-01-05SenateReferred to Finance and Tax; Appropriations; Rules
2015-12-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7015 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback