FL S1074 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2017-181), CS/CS/HB 7059 (Ch. 2017-164), HB 7097 (Ch. 2017-192)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifying that certain requirements related to the reporting of positive HIV results to county health departments apply only to testing performed in a nonhealth care setting; authorizing, rather than requiring, certain government actions related to public information initiatives about lead poisoning; removing provisions that exempt certain pain-management clinics from registration, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateWithdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2017-181), CS/CS/HB 7059 (Ch. 2017-164), HB 7097 (Ch. 2017-192)
2017-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-03-06SenateReferred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-02-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1144 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2017-181)
H1041 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-181
H543 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-134
H7059 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-164
S1670 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7059 (Ch. 2017-164)
S7006 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7097 (Ch. 2017-192)
H7097 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-192

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3814018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381983Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381984Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381985Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3820255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4650195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback