FL S1076 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 337 (Ch. 2019-58)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 337 (Ch. 2019-58)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that funds available for budgets of the clerks of the court include certain revenues from the previous year, budget amendments, and appropriated funds; revising the requirements to which a proposed budget by the clerks of the court must conform; requiring the Department of Revenue to deposit certain remitted funds in the Clerks of the Court Trust Fund rather than the General Revenue Fund, etc.
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Court
Sponsors
Senate Judiciary Committee | Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] | Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 337 (Ch. 2019-58) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-14 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/11/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1143 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 337 (Ch. 2019-58)
H337 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Chapter No. 2019-58
H337 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Chapter No. 2019-58
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 917 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 0485 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |