FL S1082 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a court to take certain actions regarding the care, possession, or control of an animal in domestic violence injunctions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Violence Injunctions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#695 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-19 Chapter No. 2020-37
2020-06-18 Approved by Governor
2020-06-03 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-06HouseIn Messages
2020-03-06SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-20SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-19SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2020-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-22SenateCS by Agriculture read 1st time
2020-01-16SenateNow in Judiciary
2020-01-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-14SenateCS by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Agriculture; Judiciary; Rules
2019-11-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H241 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1082 passed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
74130Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback