FL S1090 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Keep Our Graduates Working Act of 2019"; prohibiting a state authority from suspending or revoking a person's professional license, certificate, registration, or permit solely on the basis of a delinquency or default in the payment of his or her student loan; prohibiting a state authority from suspending or revoking a person's professional license, certificate, registration, or permit solely on the basis of a default in satisfying the requirements of his or her work-conditional scholarship, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Keep Our Graduates Working Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S948 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H991 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560721Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456074Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback