FL S1092 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Firefighter Cancer Decontamination Equipment Grant Program within the Division of State Fire Marshal of the Department of Financial Services for certain purposes; requiring the division to administer the program and annually award grants, and distribute equipment and training, to qualifying fire departments in a certain manner; requiring the State Fire Marshal to adopt rules and procedures; providing that an independent special fire control district has, and that the board of such district may exercise by majority vote, specified powers, etc.
Title
Fire Prevention and Control
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#703 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Chapter No. 2020-96 | |
2020-06-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (592500) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (584246) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/18/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/15/20, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-12-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H487 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1092 passed
S1464 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1095
S1464 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1095
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
191 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |