FL S1108 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing provisions relating to the Florida Election Campaign Financing Act; deleting provisions governing the public funding of campaigns for candidates for statewide office who agree to certain expenditure limits, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Finance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Judiciary
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-22SenateNow in Judiciary
2020-01-21SenateFavorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 4 NAYS 3
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules
2019-12-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1110 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1327 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H1325 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
106021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
106141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10622Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10630Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10631Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10632Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10633Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10634Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10635Amended CodeSee Bill Text
106353Amended CodeSee Bill Text
106355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10636Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32872Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback