FL S1118 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that a specified amount of funds relating to the Building Code Administrators and Inspectors Fund be allocated to the University of Florida M.E. Rinker, Sr. School of Construction Management; authorizing the school to use the funds for specified purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction Industry Workforce

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-02SenateCS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time
2019-03-28SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-27SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-26SenateCS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H775 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
468631Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback