FL S1124 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing individuals licensed to prescribe medicinal drugs to dispense a 48-hour supply, rather than a 24-hour supply, of such drugs to any patient, including a discharged patient, under certain circumstances; authorizing such individuals to dispense a 72-hour supply if a state of emergency has been declared in the area, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dispensing Medicinal Drugs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateLaid on Table
2019-04-30SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 1115 (Died in returning Messages)
2019-04-30SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-23SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-26SenateCS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time
2019-03-25SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-19SenateCS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-11SenateNow in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2019-03-11SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1115 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
465019Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback