FL S1144 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2017-181)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifying that certain requirements related to the reporting of positive HIV test results to county health departments apply only to testing performed in a nonhealth care setting; revising requirements of a public information initiative on lead-based-paint hazards; revising requirements on the distribution of information on childhood lead poisoning developed by the State Surgeon General or his or her designee; clarifying that the membership of the Genetics and Newborn Screening Advisory Council must include one member each from four of the medical schools in this state, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Laboratory Screening

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2017-181)
2017-05-03SenateSubstituted CS/HB 1041
2017-05-03SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/17
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-04-25SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2017-04-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-04-19SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-04-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-04-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/18/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-03-29SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2017-03-29SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2017-03-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-03-27SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-03-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/27/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-03-06SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-02-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1074 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2017-181), CS/CS/HB 7059 (Ch. 2017-164), HB 7097 (Ch. 2017-192)
H1041 (Same As) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-181

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381983Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381984Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381985Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38314Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback