FL S1150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the import, sale, purchase, and distribution of ivory articles and rhinoceros horns; providing that it is unlawful to take, possess, injure, shoot, collect, or sell Florida black bears; providing that the illegal taking, possession, injuring, shooting, collecting, or selling of Florida black bears is a Level Four violation, which is subject to criminal and civil penalties, etc.
Title
Wildlife Protection
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Environment and Natural Resources; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
379 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 4015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 4117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1150 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1150/BillText/Filed/HTML |