FL S1156 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising requirements for the implementation of certain children's initiatives; requiring the Department of Children and Families to contract with a not-for-profit corporation for certain purposes and for specified amounts, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's Initiatives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-18SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-12-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H831 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409147Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback