FL S1160 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a fee for a certain specialty license plate, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plate Fees/Florida Swims

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Infrastructure and Security
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-18SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-12-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1158 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback