FL S1168 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for complaints in the custody of any agency related to discrimination based on height or weight; providing an exemption from public records requirements for complaints in the custody of any unit of local government related to discrimination based on height or weight; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Complaints Related to Discrimination Based on Height or Weight

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Judiciary
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-18SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-12-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S644 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H863 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
H635 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1190713Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback